FL S1170 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a community pharmacy to use an automated pharmacy system under certain circumstances; providing that certain medicinal drugs stored in such system for outpatient dispensing are part of the inventory of the pharmacy providing services through such system, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automated Pharmacy Systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H687 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H1115 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4650235Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback