FL S1172 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Hope Scholarship Program; providing Department of Education obligations relating to participating students and private schools and program requirements; authorizing certain persons to elect to direct certain state sales and use tax revenue to be transferred to a nonprofit scholarship-funding organization for the Hope Scholarship Program, etc.
Title
Hope Scholarship Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 2 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education |
2018-01-24 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 4 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S1756 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
S732 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731
S1756 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
S732 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 1832 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
623 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |