FL S1186 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that judgments of guilty or not guilty of a felony be in a written record, rather than in writing, or an electronic record with the judge's electronic signature, recorded by the clerk of the circuit court; requiring that for an electronic record of a judgment of guilty, the fingerprints of a defendant be electronically captured and a certain certification be included, etc.
Title
Criminal Judgments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7081 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-98
S656 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
S656 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |