FL S1190 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that owners of cooling towers register them with the Department of Health; requiring the department to create a statewide electronic system for such registrations; requiring that owners of cooling towers obtain or update a maintenance program and plan for existing and newly installed cooling towers, by a specified date; requiring that certain culture analyses be conducted by certified environmental laboratories; authorizing an officer, employee, or agent of the department or county health department to enter a property to inspect a cooling tower, etc.
Title
Cooling Towers
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
386 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
386 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
386 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
386 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
386 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
386 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
386 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
386 | 308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
386 | 309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
386 | 3101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1190 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1190/BillText/Filed/HTML |