FL S1196 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "epinephrine injector"; requiring certain individual and group health insurance policies, respectively, to provide coverage for epinephrine injectors prescribed by the treating physician as medically necessary for an insured's family member 18 years of age or younger; requiring certain health maintenance contracts to provide coverage for epinephrine injectors prescribed by the treating physician as medically necessary for a subscriber's family member 18 years of age or younger, etc.
Title
Coverage for Epinephrine Injectors for Children
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 64161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 65791 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1196 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1196/BillText/Filed/HTML |