FL S1202 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs Program Act"; creating the Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs Program within the Department of Law Enforcement; requiring the department to contract with a nonprofit corporation to administer and manage the program; providing requirements for the disbursement of funds for the veterinary care of eligible retired law enforcement dogs; prohibiting a former handler or adopter from accumulating unused funds from a current year for use in a future year, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-12-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H907 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94369Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback