FL S1204 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a luxury ground vehicle company or a limousine vehicle company to convert its operations and its for-hire vehicles to a transportation network company and transportation network company vehicles, respectively, after a certain timeframe after providing notification to the Department of Financial Services, etc.
Title
Transportation Network Companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1393 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-140, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1024 (Ch. 2019-52)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1204 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1204/BillText/Filed/HTML |