FL S1214 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relocating provisions relating to the central abuse hotline of the Department of Children and Families; requiring animal control officers and certain agents to provide their names to hotline staff; revising requirements relating to reports of abuse involving impregnation of children; requiring individuals who are required to investigate child abuse, abandonment, or neglect to also report certain animal abuse to specified persons or agencies; requiring the department to include certain training in the training program for persons required to investigate child abuse, abandonment, or neglect, etc.
Title
Child Abuse, Abandonment, and Neglect
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |