FL S1214 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person who is not licensed as an engineer from using a specified name or title; authorizing the Board of Professional Engineers to establish fees relating to professional structural engineering licensing; authorizing the board to refuse to certify an applicant for a professional structural engineering license for certain reasons; prohibiting certain persons from practicing professional structural engineering after a specified date, etc.
Title
Engineers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2020-01-29 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1127 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
471 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 0385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |