FL S1218 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the information that private schools participating in an educational scholarship program are required to publish and provide to parents; requiring such private schools to adopt bullying and harassment policies; requiring such schools to report bullying and harassment incidents to the Department of Education, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anti-bullying and Anti-harassment in Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-29SenateNow in Rules
2020-01-28SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/13/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Education; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2019-12-11SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback