FL S1238 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a church, a synagogue, or other religious institution to allow a concealed weapons or concealed firearms licensee to carry a firearm on the property of that church, synagogue, or other religious institution for certain purposes; authorizing a private school or a religious school to designate a person to carry a firearm on that school's property, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safety of Religious Institutions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/08/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2019-03-26SenateNow in Criminal Justice
2019-03-25SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules
2019-02-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H403 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
79006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback