FL S1260 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Florida Space Exploration Monument; providing for administration of the monument by the Department of Management Services; providing for the creation of a design contest and selection committee; requiring the department to limit participation in design competitions for monuments on the Capitol Complex or at other state-owned buildings to artists and sculptors who are domiciled in this state, etc.
Title
Monuments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H981 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
265 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
265 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |