FL S1266 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Stop Social Media Censorship Act"; providing that the owner or operator of a social media website is subject to a private right of action by a social media website user in this state under certain conditions; prohibiting a social media website from using hate speech as a defense; authorizing the Attorney General to bring an action on behalf of a social media website user; providing exceptions for the deletion or censure of certain types of speech, etc.
Title
Social Media Websites
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1266 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1266/BillText/Filed/HTML |