FL S1268 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a credit against the corporate income tax, the sales and use tax, or a stated combination of the two taxes to a qualifying business that establishes a qualifying project for the creation of intellectual property which meets certain capital investment criteria; authorizing the carryover or transfer of credits, subject to certain conditions, etc.
Title
Capital Investment Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1642 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1268 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1268/BillText/Filed/HTML |