FL S1272 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 615 (Ch. 2017-135)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Occupational Opportunity Act"; revising the length of time that an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States may remain in good standing with an administrative board or program under certain circumstances; requiring, rather than authorizing, the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to issue a professional license, rather than a temporary license, to specified applicants, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 615 (Ch. 2017-135)
2017-04-26SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 615
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/17
2017-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-17SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2017-04-17SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-04-13SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2017-04-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/13/17, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-04-04SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-04-03SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 3 NAYS 0
2017-03-29SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2017-03-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 04/03/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-03-29SenateNow in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
2017-03-29SenateRemaining references corrected to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations
2017-03-29SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules
2017-03-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-03-28SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-03-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/28/17, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
2017-02-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H615 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-135

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
455219Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback