FL S1280 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "acute pain" to exclude pain related to sickle-cell anemia; excluding the treatment of such pain from limitations on the prescription of an opioid drug, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substance Prescribing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-08SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-08SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-04-01SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2019-04-01SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2019-02-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H491 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback