FL S1280 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting homeowners' associations from owning or operating an automated license plate recognition system, etc.
Title
Automated License Plate Recognition Systems
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1280 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1280/BillText/Filed/HTML |