FL S1284 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the method of calculating the district cost differential used in determining the annual allocation to school districts from the Florida Education Finance Program beginning in a specified school year; requiring the Department of Education to consult with specified individuals and entities during the development of the wage level index, etc.
Title
District Cost Differential
Sponsors
Senate Education Committee | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Annette Taddeo [D] |
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] | Sen. Oscar Braynon [D] | Sen. Anitere Flores [R] | Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1031 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
H5101 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
H5101 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |