FL S1284 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Florida Land Subsidence Research Initiative as a partnership between the Department of Environmental Protection and Florida International University; directing the department to contract with, and allocate certain funds to, Florida International University to implement the initiative; requiring Florida International University to collaborate with other state universities, develop data collection and reporting specifications, and submit reports to the Governor and Legislature by specified dates, etc.
Title
Florida Land Subsidence Research Initiative
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/17/20, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1157 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1284 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1284/BillText/Filed/HTML |