FL S1286 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the introduction of certain cannabis related substances, cellular telephones and other portable communication devices, and vapor-generating electronic devices inside specified facilities of the Department of Children and Families or of the Agency for Persons with Disabilities; providing criminal penalties; prohibiting the introduction of certain cannabis related substances and vapor-generating electronic devices inside a state correctional institution, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contraband in Specified Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#658 (Y: 71 N: 43 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22 Chapter No. 2020-59
2020-06-20 Approved by Governor
2020-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-10SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-10HouseCS passed; YEAS 71 NAYS 43
2020-03-10HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-09HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-09HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-06HouseReceived
2020-03-06HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-06HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-03HouseIn Messages
2020-03-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-03SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-26SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-02-26SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-02-26SenateAmendment(s) adopted (734836)
2020-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-19SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-13SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2020-02-13SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-31SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-01-29SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-28SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2019-12-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H745 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1286 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9161085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94447Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985711Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback