FL S1292 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for a nonjudicial record of the arrest of a minor who has successfully completed a diversion program; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Nonjudicial Arrest Record of a Minor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#728 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-09HouseIn Messages
2020-03-09SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-12SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-02-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/12/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-03SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-03SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-15SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-01-14SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-12-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S700 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
H615 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1292 passed
H1173 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1292 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430582Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback