FL S1302 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the "Florida Fair Claims Act"; increasing the statutory limits on liability for tort claims against the state and its agencies and subdivisions; revising when a state and its agencies and subdivisions may agree to settle a claim or judgment without further action from the Legislature; requiring that the limitations on tort liability be adjusted every year after a specified date; prohibiting an insurance policy from conditioning the payment of benefits on the enactment of claim bills, etc.
Title
Sovereign Immunity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 447 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
111 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
260 | 0125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
284 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
284 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 0081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 6146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
321 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 1395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 8297 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0862 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 167 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 733 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 1115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 1315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
946 | 5026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
946 | 514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
984 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |