FL S1306 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the commission adjunct to the Department of State; prescribing duties of the commission in order to ensure a suitable statewide observance of the centennial of women's suffrage; requiring the Division of Historical Resources of the department to provide administrative and staff support, etc.
Title
Women's Suffrage Centennial Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#339 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Chapter No. 2019-62 | |
2019-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19 |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-22 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1359 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1306 (Ch. 2019-62)