FL S1312 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing reduced criminal penalties for distribution or possession of certain amounts of cannabis concentrate or THC in cannabis products or edibles, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn from further consideration
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules
2019-02-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1093 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89315Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback