FL S1314 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting the requirement that the Department of Economic Opportunity manage certain activities related to the commercialization of specified products, services, and ideas; redesignating the Institute for the Commercialization of Public Research as the Institute for Commercialization of Florida Technology; requiring that certain proceeds be returned to the Florida Technology Seed Capital Fund after the payment of certain costs and fees, etc.
Title
Florida Capital Formation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Messages |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2018-03-09 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/21/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-02-07 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1181 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
H1285 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-139
H1285 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-139
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9623 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 96255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9627 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |