FL S1320 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing specified fee waivers for graduate students who meet certain requirements, etc.
Title
Postsecondary Fee Waivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H819 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee