FL S1322 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting an exemption from specified tuition and fees for students enrolled in approved apprenticeship programs at specified institutions, etc.
Title
Postsecondary Fee Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Education |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6035 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1322 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1322/BillText/Filed/HTML |