FL S1324 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1105
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Florida Court Educational Council to establish certain standards for instruction of circuit and county court judges for dependency cases; authorizing circuit courts to create early childhood court programs; requiring the Office of the State Courts Administrator to provide or contract for specified duties; requiring the court to retain jurisdiction over a child under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1105
2020-03-11SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1105
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-02-26SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-02-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-24SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-20SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2020-02-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-28SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-01-28SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-27SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/28/20, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-01-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-15SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/15/20, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-12-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H449 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S236 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H43 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-40
H1105 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-138
S122 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 43
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390138Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091451Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63093Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback