FL S1326 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expresses the legislative intent to revise laws relating to public records and public meetings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SSB/Public Records and Public Meetings [GPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00094
2010-02-03 Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules
2010-01-21 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback