FL S1326 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Education to create a pilot program for the lowest-performing public schools in this state which have a large population of economically disadvantaged students; providing that the pilot program create a public and private partnership to supply certain services to economically disadvantaged students; providing a statement of purpose for the pilot program; providing the duties of the department for each year of the pilot program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Pilot Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03SenateDied in Education
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced
2013-03-04SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2013-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1401 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback