FL S1326 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying the availability of a cause of action with respect to a governmental entity implementing a Flood Insurance Rate Map; revising the duties of the Division of Emergency Management to conform to changes made by the act; requiring the division to contract for a flood risk analysis; exempting state employees from specified travel expense provisions when traveling under the Emergency Management Assistance Compact pursuant to a request for assistance from another state under certain circumstances; providing appropriations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Management

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02SenateDied in Appropriations
2014-04-02SenateNow in Appropriations
2014-04-01SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2014-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/01/14, 3:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2014-03-25SenateNow in Community Affairs
2014-03-25SenateRemaining references corrected to Community Affairs; Appropriations
2014-03-20SenateCS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
2014-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2014-03-19SenateCS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2014-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/19/14, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2014-03-04SenateIntroduced
2014-03-04SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Community Affairs
2014-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7065 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2529335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70001Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback