FL S1326 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing transportation network company (TNC) and TNC driver insurance requirements; prohibiting a TNC from owning, controlling, operating, or managing the vehicles used by TNC drivers; requiring a TNC driver to exclusively accept rides booked through the TNC's digital network or software application service, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Network Companies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Regulated Industries
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-03-02SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2015-02-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0817 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316680Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316682Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316684Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback