FL S1326 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definitions of the terms "home health agency" and "organization" to include certain marketing organizations for providers of home health, homemaker, and companion services, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Health Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateWithdrawn from further consideration
2017-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2017-03-15SenateIntroduced
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2017-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H915 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
400462Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback