FL S1326 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring certain women inmates within the state and county correctional systems who have newborn children to be allowed specified visitation and physical touch privileges with their newborn children; authorizing the Department of Corrections to adopt rules relating to the visiting hours and privileges of such inmates; requiring sheriffs and chief correctional officers to adopt model standards relating to such inmates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incarcerated Women with Newborn Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-02-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1015 (Similar To) 2019-02-22 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H49 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-65

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
951175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95123Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback