FL S1326 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Children and Families to establish performance metrics; requiring sheriffs providing certain services to adopt the child welfare practice model; requiring the department to establish an Office of Quality; adding responsibilities to the department of contracts regarding care for children in the child welfare system; requiring the Florida Institute for Child Welfare and the Florida State University College of Social Work to design and implement a specified curriculum, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#673 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-09HouseIn Messages
2020-03-09SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-03-06SenateAmendment(s) adopted (216532)
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-03SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-27SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2020-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-28SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-01-28SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/28/20, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-21SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-01-21SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-12-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7063 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4027305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409997Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1326
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1326/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1326/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1326/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1326/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1326/Amendment/353820/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1326/Amendment/835096/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1326/Amendment/272028/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1326/Amendment/756300/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1326/Vote/SenateVote_s01326e1025.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1326/Vote/HouseVote_s01326e1673.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback