FL S1332 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 133
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 133
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing local governments to enact rates to tow or immobilize vessels on private property and to remove and store vessels under specified circumstances; prohibiting counties from enacting certain ordinances or rules that impose fees or charges on authorized wrecker operators or towing businesses; authorizing certain persons to place liens on vehicles or vessels to recover specified fees or charges; revising requirements regarding notices and signs concerning the towing or removal of vehicles or vessels, etc.
Title
Towing and Immobilizing Vehicles and Vessels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 133 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 133 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS/CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Now in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H133 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-174
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 0103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 01047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 04465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
323 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
715 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |