FL S1342 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising provisions for enforcement of specified provisions using a traffic infraction detector; providing that initiating a proceeding to challenge the delivery or attempted delivery of the notice of violation or a citation waives any challenge or dispute as to delivery; providing circumstances under which a reviewing traffic enforcement officer may issue a notice of violation or traffic citation for a red light violation; requiring traffic control signals to maintain certain signal intervals and display durations based on posted speeds, etc.
Title
Traffic Control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2013-03-27 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/21/13, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1061 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160)
H1203 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee
H1203 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 0083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |