FL S1342 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the eligibility criteria for the expunction and sealing of criminal history records to allow for expunction and sealing for a conviction of possession of a certain amount of cannabis, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court-ordered Expunction and Sealing of Certain Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-12-23SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430585Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943059Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback