FL S1352 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1039
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1039
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "transportation network company digital advertising device"; deleting for-hire vehicles from the list of vehicles that are excluded from transportation network company (TNC) provisions; authorizing TNC drivers or their designees to contract with companies to install TNC digital advertising devices on TNC vehicles; defining the term "luxury ground transportation network company"; authorizing entities to elect to be regulated as luxury ground TNCs by notifying the Department of Financial Services, etc.
Title
Transportation Companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1039 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1039 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1039 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-87
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security