FL S1354 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising requirements for the uniform statewide voter registration application and the acceptance of such applications; deleting an exemption from public records requirements for information related to a voter registration applicant's or voter's prior felony conviction and his or her restoration of voting rights to conform to changes made by the act, etc.
Title
Statewide Voter Registration Application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
97 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |