FL S1360 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a practitioner who prescribes controlled substances to recommend specified alternative treatments for chronic nonmalignant pain before prescribing a controlled substance to a patient; requiring certain insurance policies to provide coverage for a minimum number of visits to alternative treatment providers for the treatment of chronic nonmalignant pain under certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative Treatments to Controlled Substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2019-02-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1073 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627413Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback