FL S1366 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising science credits required for a standard high school diploma; authorizing school districts and consortiums of school districts to apply to the Department of Education for funding for professional development for classroom teachers to provide instruction in computer science courses and content; expanding the number of CAPE Digital Tool certificates relating to certain areas which the department must annually identify and the Commissioner of Education may recommend, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-20SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-19SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7055 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S770 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
H7071 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-119

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10023105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100349Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10072616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100825Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100844Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009893Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback