FL S1366 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1089
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1089
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing trustees of certain trusts to reimburse persons being treated as the owner of the trust for specified amounts and in a specified manner; prohibiting certain policies, values, and proceeds from being used for such reimbursement; requiring that specified powers be granted to certain persons if the terms of the trust require a trustee to act at the direction or with the consent of such persons or that specified decisions be made directly by such persons, etc.
Title
Trusts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1089 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1089 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-13 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1089 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-70