FL S1368 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating an electric and hybrid fleet vehicle rebate program within the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; requiring the department to determine and publish certain information regarding the availability of funds on its website; requiring the department to provide an annual assessment of the program to the Governor, the Legislature, and the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability, etc.
Title
Fleet Vehicle Rebate Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Now in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1368 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1368/BillText/Filed/HTML |