FL S1368 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain commercial driver schools to offer as part of their curriculum either a human trafficking prevention course administered by the Department of Law Enforcement or by a certain organization or certain industry-specific training; requiring that a specified amount of time in a school bus driver training program provided by a district school board be allocated to certain industry-specific training, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking Prevention
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H633 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
488 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1368 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1368/BillText/Filed/HTML |