FL S1370 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying that certain utilities are not exempt from providing medically essential electric service; providing notification requirements for electric utilities relating to the certification process for obtaining medically essential electric service and service disconnection; requiring such practitioners to provide patients with completed medical certifications and document the certification, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medically Essential Electric Utility Service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Health Policy; Rules
2019-02-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H651 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45645Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback