FL S1370 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 763
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring certain licensed facilities to biennially conduct an anonymous patient safety culture survey using a specified federal publication; requiring the agency to collect, compile, and publish patient safety culture survey data submitted by facilities; revising requirements for the submission of health care data to the agency, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Safety Culture Surveys

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 763
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 763
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-27SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2020-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/18/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-12SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2020-01-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H763 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-134

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408061Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback