FL S1374 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for enactment of the agreement; requiring a statewide popular election for President and Vice President of the United States; providing that the agreement becomes effective upon the occurrence of specified actions, etc.
Title
Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-12-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H367 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1374 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1374/BillText/Filed/HTML |