FL S1392 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising provisions governing the payment of subsistence and travel reimbursement for Supreme Court justices who designate an official headquarters other than the headquarters of the Supreme Court; authorizing district court of appeal judges who meet certain criteria to have an appropriate facility in their county of residence designated as their official headquarters; specifying eligibility for subsistence and travel reimbursement, subject to the availability of funds; providing that a county is not required to provide space for a judge in a county courthouse, etc.
Title
Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#711 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Chapter No. 2020-61 | |
2020-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/13/20, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7057 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1392 passed
H7059 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1510 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7059 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1510 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |