FL S1404 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying powers and duties of the Division of Public Assistance Fraud; prohibiting individuals working for entities covered by the State Risk Management Trust Fund from engaging in retaliatory conduct against sexual harassment victims; prohibiting persons from acting as or advertising themselves as being funeral directors, embalmers, direct disposers, or preneed sales agents unless they are so licensed; providing that certain persons serving as volunteer firefighters may serve as a regular or permanent firefighter for a limited period, subject to certain restrictions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied on Calendar
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-10SenateRetained on Calendar
2020-03-09SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-06SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-03SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 8
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/18/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-27SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2020-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2020-01-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1077 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
S1594 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28430Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28431Amended CodeSee Bill Text
284385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4971411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
552081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5537921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6262815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62770132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943045Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback